Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Rodríguez Hermosino

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jun 1662AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
17 Sep 1662Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
23 Jan 1669DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Rodríguez Hermosino:
Bishop Nicolás Rodríguez Hermosino (died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 99
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 195, Number 1,225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013