Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gorgônio Alves da Encarnação Neto, C.R.

Bishop of Itapetininga, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1949 BornFartura
22 Dec 197425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
15 Apr 199848.6AppointedBishop of Itapetininga, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Jul 199848.8Ordained BishopBishop of Itapetininga, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gorgônio Alves da Encarnação Neto:
Bishop Gorgônio Alves da Encarnação Neto C.R. (born ) Bishop of Itapetininga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itapetininga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013