Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Aldazor, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1785Born
26 Jun 180217.0ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
17 Dec 180823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
23 Dec 185873.5AppointedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
2 Oct 185974.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
9 Mar 186175.7InstalledBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
22 Aug 186681.1DiedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Aldazor (VIAF: 198941838)
Bishop Nicolás Aldazor O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Rioja
Ordained BishopSan Francisco, Convent, Buenos Aires, Diocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 321
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,859, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast