Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Remigio de La Santa y Ortega

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1745BornYecla, Spain
18 Jun 179246.7AppointedBishop of Panamá
23 Dec 179247.2Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
24 Jul 179751.8AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
179852.3InstalledBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
10 Aug 181670.9ResignedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
31 May 181872.7SelectedBishop of Lérida, Spain
26 Jun 181872.7ConfirmedBishop of Lérida, Spain
14 Nov 181873.1DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Remigio de La Santa y Ortega:
Bishop Remigio de La Santa y Ortega (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 222
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 110, Number 573

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013