Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Clemens Alba Palacios

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca

Titular Archbishop of Naraggara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1909BornSan Juan de Ocampo
26 Mar 193222.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 195444.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
5 Apr 195444.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amisus
29 Jun 195444.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amisus
8 Aug 195949.7AppointedBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
6 Sep 197060.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
6 Sep 197060.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naraggara
15 Nov 198475.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
21 Feb 199787.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Clemens Alba Palacios:
Bishop José de Jesús Clemens Alba Palacios (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013