Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marko Alaupovic

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Titular Archbishop of Segisama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1885Born
15 Sep 190722.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 195065.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
21 May 195065.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Capitolias
24 Sep 195065.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capitolias
7 Sep 196075.3AppointedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
13 Jan 197084.6RetiredArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
13 Jan 197084.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Segisama
18 Apr 197993.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Marko Alaupovic
Archbishop Marko Alaupovic (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBusovaca

  • a priest for 71.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1979
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast