Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Shantou [Swatow]

Dioecesis Scianteuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 20,000 (7,725 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Shantou, Guangdong, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kiaotsu
6 April 1914ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong) Vicariate Apostolic of Kiaotsu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Swatow [Shantou]
18 August 1915Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kiaotsu Vicariate Apostolic of Swatow [Shantou]
20 February 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Swatow [Shantou] Prefecture Apostolic of Kaying [Meixian] (erected)
Diocese of Shantou [Swatow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Swatow [Shantou] Diocese of Shantou [Swatow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Shantou [Swatow]
195030,0005,000,000.6%59595081530ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.3, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast