Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Baptist Cardinal Wu Cheng-chung

Deceased

Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

Cardinal-Priest of Beata Vergine Maria del Monte Carmelo a Mostacciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1925Born
6 Jul 195227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hsinchu, Taiwan
5 Apr 197550.0AppointedBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
25 Jul 197550.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
28 Jun 198863.2Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198863.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Beata Vergine Maria del Monte Carmelo a Mostacciano
23 Sep 200277.4DiedBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Wu Cheng-chung (VIAF: 51459187)
John Baptist Cardinal Wu Cheng-chung (born , died ) Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHo Hau, Vicariate Apostolic of Swatow [Shantou]
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Hong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Hong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]
Death PlaceQueen Mary, Hospital, Hong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]
Buried Place (Original)St. Michael's Catholic, Cemetery, Happy Valley, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
  • a cardinal for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast