Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]

Archidioecesis Coamceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Gan Junqiu, Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 43,332 (16,736 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission She-Se, Guangzhou, Guangdong, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong)
11 May 1848ErectedDiocese of Macau Prefecture Apostolic of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong) (erected)
6 August 1875Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong) Prefecture Apostolic of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi) (erected)
6 April 1914Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong) Vicariate Apostolic of Kiaotsu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou]
6 April 1914ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kouangtong (Kwangtung, Guangdong) Vicariate Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou]
9 April 1920Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou] Vicariate Apostolic of Shiuchow [Shaoguan] (erected)
1 August 1920Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou] Vicariate Apostolic of Western Kwangtung and Hainan {Kuangtong Occidentale ed Hainan} (erected)
31 January 1924Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou] Prefecture Apostolic of Kongmoon [Jiangmen] (erected)
Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou] Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
194920,3464,800,000.4%441761333941ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 17 Oct 2020

Quantcast