Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Zhou Jishi (Chow Chi-shih, Ceuziscee), C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1892Born
191522.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
29 Jun 191927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
26 Mar 193139.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Paotingfu, China
26 Mar 193139.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cratia
2 Aug 193139.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cratia
11 Apr 194654.2AppointedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-Yüan], China
18 Jul 194654.4AppointedArchbishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China
1972²79.9DiedArchbishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zhou Jishi (Chow Chi-shih, Ceuziscee)
Archbishop Joseph Zhou Jishi (Chow Chi-shih, Ceuziscee) C.M. (born , died 1972) Archbishop of Nanchang [Nanchang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSialkwongyang
Ordained BishopPeking

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1931, Number 42
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast