Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jāzeps Rancāns

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia

Titular Bishop of Marcopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1886Born
12 Jun 191124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mohilev, Belarus
29 Oct 192337.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia
29 Oct 192337.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
4 May 192437.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
3 Dec 196983.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Jāzeps Rancāns (VIAF: 43282628)
Bishop Jāzeps Rancāns (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Riga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLudza
Ordained PriestJaunavas Marijas, Church, St. Petersburg
Ordained BishopSvētā Jēkaba, Cathedral, Riga, Archdiocese of Riga
Death PlaceSt. Mary's, Hospital, Grand Rapids, Diocese of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
Buried Place (Original)Resurrection, Cemetery, Grand Rapids, Diocese of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
Buried Place (Current)Svētā Jēkaba, Cathedral Basilica, Riga, Archdiocese of Riga

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1924, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast