Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paul Louis Marie Audren, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yünnanfu, China

Priest of La Société des Missions Etrangères


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1890Born
20 Mar 192029.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 Apr 193241.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Yünnanfu, China
26 Apr 193241.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pomaria
2 May 193241.5ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Yünnanfu, China
2 May 193241.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Pomaria
20 Feb 196675.3DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yünnanfu, China

MicroData Summary for Paul Louis Marie Audren
Father Paul Louis Marie Audren M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yünnanfu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÉvran, France

  • a priest for 45.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast