Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Valentín Faustino Berrio Ochoa, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1827Born
14 Jun 185124.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 185427.7ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
28 Dec 185730.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
28 Dec 185730.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
27 Jun 185831.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
28 Jul 185831.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
1 Nov 186134.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
20 May 1906Beatified
19 Jun 1988Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Valentín Faustino Berrio Ochoa (VIAF: 10655290)
Bishop St. Valentín Faustino Berrio Ochoa O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElorrio, Spain
Ordained BishopNinh Cuong

  • a priest for 10.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 166, Number 913
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 33
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,867

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast