Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Yevgeniy Zinkovskiy

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Karaganda, Kazakhstan

Titular Bishop of Maiuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1975 Born
1 Aug 199924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Karaganda, Kazakhstan
29 Jun 202145.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan
29 Jun 202145.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Maiuca
12 Sep 202146.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maiuca

MicroData Summary for Yevgeniy Zinkovskiy
Father Yevgeniy Zinkovskiy (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Karaganda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShortandy, Apostolic Administration of Kazakhstan
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Fatima, Cathedral, Karaganda, Diocese of Karaganda

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Karaganda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2021
  • ob/c2+: JI, 24 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast