Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Carlos Zilli, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bafatá, Guinea-Bissau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1954Born
6 Jul 198429.7Solemn VowsMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
7 Jul 198429.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
5 Jan 198530.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
13 Mar 200146.4AppointedBishop of Bafatá, Guinea-Bissau
30 Jun 200146.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bafatá, Guinea-Bissau
19 Aug 200146.8InstalledBishop of Bafatá, Guinea-Bissau
31 Mar 202166.4DiedBishop of Bafatá, Guinea-Bissau

MicroData Summary for Pedro Carlos Zilli
Bishop Pedro Carlos Zilli P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Bafatá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz do Rio Pardo
Ordained PriestIbiporã, Archdiocese of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esportes Munheção, Ibiporã, Archdiocese of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
Death PlaceBissau, Diocese of Bissau

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,997
  • d: CB, 31 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Apr 2021

Quantcast