Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Mieceslaus Zaleski

Deceased

Bishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1906Born
12 Jul 193125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
28 Mar 195043.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
28 Mar 195043.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
23 May 195043.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
7 Oct 196458.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
1 Dec 196559.4SucceededBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
16 May 197568.8DiedBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Alexander Mieceslaus Zaleski (VIAF: 1694151247981244270004)
Bishop Alexander Mieceslaus Zaleski (born , died ) Bishop of Lansing

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaurel, NY

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 30
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 990, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast