Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florentino Zabalza Iturri, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1924Born
20 Jul 194722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
7 Jun 197146.6AppointedPrelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
7 Jun 197146.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
28 Aug 197146.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
26 May 197853.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
12 Jan 199469.2ResignedPrelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
12 Sep 200075.9DiedPrelate Emeritus of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Florentino Zabalza Iturri
Bishop Florentino Zabalza Iturri O.A.R. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Lábrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiguezal, Spain
Ordained BishopRibeirão Preto, Archdiocese of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 784
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast