Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
6 Jun 1972 | Born | ||
11 Jan 1998 | 25.5 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia |
25 Nov 2003 | 31.4 | Incardinated | Priest of Emdeber (Ethiopian), Ethiopia |
16 Dec 2023 | 51.5 | Appointed | Coadjutor Bishop of Emdeber (Ethiopian), Ethiopia |
11 Feb 2024 | 51.6 | Ordained Bishop | Coadjutor Bishop of Emdeber (Ethiopian), Ethiopia |
(WikiData: Q123859853)
Bishop
Lukas Teshome Fikre
Woldetensae
(born )
Coadjutor Bishop
of Emdeber
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Guraghe |
Ordained Bishop | St. Anthony, Cathedral, Emdeber, Eparchy of Emdeber (Ethiopian) |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 1 Apr 2024 |
✠