Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Enrique Witte, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concepción, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1926Born
11 Apr 195427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Apr 197750.7AppointedBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
20 May 197750.8Ordained BishopBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
5 Jun 197750.8InstalledBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
8 Jul 199265.9AppointedBishop of Concepción, Argentina
30 Aug 199266.0InstalledBishop of Concepción, Argentina
28 Jul 200175.0RetiredBishop of Concepción, Argentina
21 Feb 201588.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Concepción, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Enrique Witte
Bishop Bernardo Enrique Witte O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVardingholt, Germany
Ordained BishopCathedral, Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Diocese of Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 22 Feb 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast