Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando José María Rossi, O.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Concepción, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1945 Born
20 Dec 197025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Nov 200055.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Concepción, Argentina
22 Dec 200055.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Concepción, Argentina
28 Jul 200156.2SucceededBishop of Concepción, Argentina
19 Mar 202074.9RetiredBishop of Concepción, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Armando José María Rossi
Bishop Armando José María Rossi O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires
Ordained BishopSan Ramón Nonato, Cathedral, San Ramón de la Nueva Orán, Diocese of Orán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Concepción.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,871
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast