Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Friedrich Wehrle

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Nova Germania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1940 Born
15 May 196928.9Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
14 Apr 198140.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
14 Apr 198140.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Germania
5 Jul 198141.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Germania
30 Jul 201272.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul Friedrich Wehrle
Bishop Paul Friedrich Wehrle (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSingen
Ordained BishopFreiburg im Breisgau, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast