Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Walczykiewicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1886Born
1912²25.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 192841.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Ukraine
20 Jul 192841.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
25 Nov 192842.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
12 May 194053.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefan Walczykiewicz
Bishop Stefan Walczykiewicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGostynin

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,589
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1928, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast