Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolf Piotr Szelążek

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1865Born
26 May 188822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Płock, Poland
29 Jul 191852.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
29 Jul 191852.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
24 Nov 191853.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
14 Dec 192560.3AppointedBishop of Lutsk, Ukraine
24 Feb 192660.5InstalledBishop of Lutsk, Ukraine
9 Feb 195084.5DiedBishop of Lutsk, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Adolf Piotr Szelążek (VIAF: 164216675)
Bishop Adolf Piotr Szelążek (born , died ) Bishop of Lutsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStoczek Łukówski

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1918, Number 56
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 79
  • c1: CB, 2 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast