Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton Vovk

Deceased

Archbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

Apostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija)

Note/Previous Titular See: (AA of the Slovenian portions)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1900Born
29 Jun 192323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
15 Sep 194646.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
15 Sep 194646.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
1 Dec 194646.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cardicium
21 Apr 195150.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
26 Nov 195959.5AppointedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
21 Dec 196161.5AppointedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
6 Jul 196363.1DiedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Anton Vovk
Archbishop Anton Vovk (born , died ) Archbishop of Ljubljana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreznica
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ljubljana, Diocese of Ljubljana

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1964
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 103
  • aadm: CB, 29 Jul 2020
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast