Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Raúl Villalobos Padilla

Bishop Emeritus of Saltillo, Coahuila, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1921 Born
2 Apr 194928.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 197150.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
4 May 197150.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Columnata
3 Aug 197150.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Columnata
4 Oct 197554.6AppointedBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
30 Dec 199978.9RetiredBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Raúl Villalobos Padilla
Bishop Francisco Raúl Villalobos Padilla (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saltillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara
Ordained BishopSaint Jacques, Cathedral, Saltillo, Diocese of Saltillo, Coahuila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saltillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 875

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast