Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vittorio Francesco Viola, O.F.M.

Secretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Bishop Emeritus of Tortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1965 Born
14 Sep 199125.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
4 Jul 199226.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jul 199327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Oct 201449.0AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
7 Dec 201449.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
14 Dec 201449.1InstalledBishop of Tortona, Italy
27 May 202155.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
27 May 202155.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Francesco Viola (VIAF: 306399963)
Archbishop Vittorio Francesco Viola O.F.M. (born ) Secretary of Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiella, Diocese of Biella, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria degli Angeli alla Porziuncola, Church, Assisi, Diocese of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2014
  • ob: CB, 21 Oct 2014
  • c2+: CB, 3 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,324
  • i/loc: AM, 25 Sep 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 May 2021

Quantcast