Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Vangeke, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bereina, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1904Born
14 Jun 193732.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
21 Sep 197066.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
21 Sep 197066.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Culusi
3 Dec 197066.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Culusi
1 Mar 197671.6AppointedBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
30 Oct 197975.3RetiredBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
15 Dec 198278.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bereina, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Louis Vangeke
Bishop Louis Vangeke M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bereina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOgofoina
Ordained BishopSainte Marie, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney, Australia

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 614

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast