Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Vacca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alghero-Bosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1934Born
28 Jul 195722.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 199358.5AppointedBishop of Alghero-Bosa, Italy
21 Mar 199358.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero-Bosa, Italy
31 May 200469.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sassari, Italy
14 Sep 200470.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Sassari, Italy
29 Sep 200672.1ResignedBishop of Alghero-Bosa, Italy
22 Dec 202086.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Alghero-Bosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vacca
Bishop Antonio Vacca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alghero-Bosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuartu Sant'Elena
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de Bonaria, Basilica, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Death PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,154
  • d: CB, 22 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast