Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mister José Joaquín Troconis Montiel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1939 Born
17 Nov 196324.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 197738.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia en Venezuela
18 Nov 197738.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
20 Jan 197838.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
198646.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia en Venezuela
198646.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus

MicroData Summary for José Joaquín Troconis Montiel
Mister José Joaquín Troconis Montiel (born )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaracaibo, Archdiocese of Maracaibo, Venezuela
Ordained BishopMaracaibo, Archdiocese of Maracaibo, Venezuela

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • laic: CB, 24 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast