Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Baptiste Trần Hữu Ðức

Deceased

Bishop of Vinh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1891Born
2 Apr 192735.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 195159.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Vinh, Viet Nam
14 Jun 195159.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicius
16 Sep 195160.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicius
24 Nov 196069.4AppointedBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
5 Jan 197179.5DiedBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptiste Trần Hữu Ðức
Bishop Jean Baptiste Trần Hữu Ðức (born , died ) Bishop of Vinh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTho Hoang
Ordained BishopThanh Hoa

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 92
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast