Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacob Thoomkuzhy

Archbishop Emeritus of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1930 Born
22 Dec 195626.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 197342.2AppointedBishop of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabar), India
1 May 197342.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabar), India
18 May 199564.4AppointedBishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabar), India
11 Nov 199665.9AppointedArchbishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
22 Jan 200776.1RetiredArchbishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Jacob Thoomkuzhy
Archbishop Jacob Thoomkuzhy (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trichur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilakumadam
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Mananthavady, Eparchy of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Trichur (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast