Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balashoury Thanugundla

Deceased

Bishop of Guntur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1928Born
7 Dec 195729.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 197345.6AppointedBishop of Guntur, India
12 Mar 197445.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guntur, India
25 Sep 197446.4DiedBishop of Guntur, India

MicroData Summary for Balashoury Thanugundla
Bishop Balashoury Thanugundla (born , died ) Bishop of Guntur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReddipalem
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Fatima, Warangal, Diocese of Warangal

  • a priest for 16.7 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,481
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,697

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast