Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Terrés, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Cidyessus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1843Born
21 Aug 185916.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
26 May 186623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Apr 187431.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
21 Apr 187431.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
5 Dec 187532.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
1 Jun 188340.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
2 Apr 190663.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for José Terrés
Bishop José Terrés O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Estebán de Granollers, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain
Ordained BishopKe-Ne

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,868, Page 43, Number 20
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 71
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,871

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast