Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban Sánchez de las Heras, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Amoy, China

Titular Bishop of Zaraï


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1851Born
186816.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1878²26.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Jan 189543.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China
15 Jan 189543.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaraï
12 May 189543.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaraï
21 Jun 189644.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Esteban Sánchez de las Heras
Bishop Esteban Sánchez de las Heras O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Amoy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTudela, Diocese of Tudela, Spain
Ordained BishopFoochow
Death PlaceAmoy, Vicariate Apostolic of Amoy

  • a priest for 18.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 602
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 34
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast