Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evarist Zhang (Chang) Zhiliang

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tsining [Jining], China

Titular Bishop of Cotenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1887Born
28 Dec 191730.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 192941.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tsining [Jining], China
2 Feb 192941.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cotenna
14 Apr 192942.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cotenna
26 May 193245.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Tsining [Jining], China

MicroData Summary for Evarist Zhang (Chang) Zhiliang
Bishop Evarist Zhang (Chang) Zhiliang (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tsining [Jining]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLantzechan
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceTsining, Vicariate Apostolic of Tsining [Jining]

  • a priest for 14.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 29
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast