Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Tamayo, O.S. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Botrys

Titular See: (Prior de Ucles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1744Born
29 Sep 176824.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 179753.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
25 Mar 179853.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
Nov 1799³55.4DiedTitular Bishop of Botrys

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Tamayo
Bishop Juan Antonio Tamayo O.S. (born , died Nov 1799) Titular Bishop of Botrys

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoratalla, Spain
Ordained BishopMadrid

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 117, Number 613
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 128, and Page 455
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast