Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Beltrán Serrano

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1704Born
18 Jul 176358.7AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
25 Sep 176358.9Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
30 Nov 178379.1DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Beltrán Serrano (VIAF: 9723386)
Bishop Felipe Beltrán Serrano (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSierra de Engarcerán
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 81, Number 404
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 27
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,987

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast