Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julianus Kemo Sunarko, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Purwokerto, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1941Born
3 Dec 197533.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 May 200058.3AppointedBishop of Purwokerto, Indonesia
8 Sep 200058.7Ordained BishopBishop of Purwokerto, Indonesia
29 Dec 201675.0RetiredBishop of Purwokerto, Indonesia
26 Jun 202078.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Purwokerto, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Julianus Kemo Sunarko
Bishop Julianus Kemo Sunarko S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Purwokerto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinggir
Ordained BishopStade Satria, Purwokerto, Diocese of Purwokerto
Death PlaceElisabeth, Hospital, Semarang, Archdiocese of Semarang

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,830
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2016
  • d: CB, 26 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Jun 2020

Quantcast