Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Soetandio Djajasiswaja

Deceased

Bishop of Bandung, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1931Born
7 Sep 195826.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 198452.5AppointedBishop of Bandung, Indonesia
11 Nov 198452.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bandung, Indonesia
19 Jan 200674.1DiedBishop of Bandung, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Alexander Soetandio Djajasiswaja (VIAF: 4571918)
Bishop Alexander Soetandio Djajasiswaja (born , died ) Bishop of Bandung

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSurakarta
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Bandung, Diocese of Bandung

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,524

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast