Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrés Stanovnik, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop of Corrientes, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1949 Born
16 Jul 197828.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Sep 197828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Oct 200151.8AppointedBishop of Reconquista, Argentina
16 Dec 200152.0Ordained BishopBishop of Reconquista, Argentina
27 Sep 200757.7AppointedArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina
1 Aug 201767.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Orán, Argentina
18 May 201868.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Orán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Andrés Stanovnik
Archbishop Andrés Stanovnik O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop of Corrientes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained PriestNuestra Seńora del Rosario de Nueva Pompeya, Shrine, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reconquista, Diocese of Reconquista

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Corrientes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,091
  • ab: CB, 1 Aug 2017
  • c1: CB, 2 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast