Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Stack

Archbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain

Apostolic Administrator of Menevia, Wales


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1946 Born
21 May 197226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
12 Apr 200154.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
12 Apr 200154.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
10 May 200155.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
19 Apr 201164.9AppointedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
20 Jun 201165.1InstalledArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
11 Jul 201973.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Stack
Archbishop George Stack (born ) Archbishop of Cardiff

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCork City, County Cork, Diocese of Cork and Ross, Ireland
Ordained PriestSts. Mary and Joseph, Church, Poplar, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cardiff.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,975
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • c1: CL, 13 Apr 2018
  • ab: CB, 11 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast