Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Titus Seo Sang-Bum

Bishop of Korea, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1961 Born
12 Feb 198827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
2 Feb 202159.9AppointedBishop of Korea, Military
9 Apr 202160.1Ordained BishopBishop of Korea, Military

MicroData Summary for Titus Seo Sang-Bum
Bishop Titus Seo Sang-Bum (born ) Bishop of Korea, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeoul, Archdiocese of Seoul

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Korea, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2021
  • ob: CB, 17 Feb 2021
  • c2+: CB, 9 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Apr 2021

Quantcast