Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Maria Splett

Deceased

Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1898Born
10 Jul 192123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
13 Jun 193840.4AppointedBishop of Gdańsk, Poland
24 Aug 193840.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gdańsk, Poland
5 Dec 194042.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
4 Aug 194648.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
5 Mar 196466.1DiedBishop of Gdańsk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Karl Maria Splett
Bishop Karl Maria Splett (born , died ) Bishop of Gdańsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZoppot
Ordained BishopCathedral, Dantzig Oliva

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 63
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,630

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast