Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rodrigo de Moura Telles

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1643³Born
24 Jun 167835.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Dec 168340.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 169451.3AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
14 Nov 169451.7Ordained BishopBishop of Guarda, Portugal
10 Mar 170461.0AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
4 Sep 172885.5DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo de Moura Telles
Archbishop Rodrigo de Moura Telles (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 126, and Page 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast