Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António de Santa Maria, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹Born
18 Jul 167860.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria
30 Oct 167860.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria
9 Apr 168567.2AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
1 Sep 168870.6DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António de Santa Maria
Bishop António de Santa Maria O.F.M. Ref. (born 1618, died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamego, Diocese of Lamego
Ordained BishopS. Antoine, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 185, and Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 30
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast