Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel Pereira, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1625Born
16 Nov 167651.8AppointedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 Jan 167751.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
1680²54.9ResignedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
6 Jan 168862.9DiedBishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manoel Pereira
Bishop Manoel Pereira O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast