Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcolino Esmeraldo de Souza Dantas

Deceased

Archbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1888Born
30 Oct 191022.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 192941.1AppointedBishop of Natal, Brazil
19 May 192941.3Ordained BishopBishop of Natal, Brazil
16 Feb 195264.0AppointedArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
8 Apr 196779.2DiedArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Marcolino Esmeraldo de Souza Dantas
Archbishop Marcolino Esmeraldo de Souza Dantas (born , died ) Archbishop of Natal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInhambupe

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast