Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marek Solarczyk

Bishop of Radom, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1967 Born
28 May 199225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
8 Oct 201144.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
8 Oct 201144.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hólar
19 Nov 201144.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hólar
4 Jan 202153.7AppointedBishop of Radom, Poland
8 Jan 202153.7InstalledBishop of Radom, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marek Solarczyk
Bishop Marek Solarczyk (born ) Bishop of Radom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWołomin
Ordained BishopSaint Michel l`Archange et Saint Florien, Cathedral, Warszawa-Praga, Diocese of Warszawa-Praga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Radom.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2011
  • ob: CB, 12 Oct 2011
  • c2+: CB, 25 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,181
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2021
  • i: CB, 12 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast