Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Cruz Sobreviñas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Imus, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1924Born
10 Mar 195530.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 197955.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
7 Apr 197955.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tulana
25 May 197955.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tulana
25 Feb 199368.8AppointedBishop of Imus, Philippines
22 Oct 200177.5RetiredBishop of Imus, Philippines
18 Jul 202096.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Imus, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Manuel Cruz Sobreviñas
Bishop Manuel Cruz Sobreviñas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Imus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDinalpihan
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila
Death PlaceCardinal Santos Medical Center, San Juan City

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015
  • d: CB, 18 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast