Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Singaroyan Sebastianappan

Bishop Emeritus of Salem, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1952 Born
27 May 197826.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 200048.2AppointedBishop of Salem, India
18 Oct 200048.5Ordained BishopBishop of Salem, India
9 Mar 202067.9ResignedBishop of Salem, India

MicroData Summary for Singaroyan Sebastianappan
Bishop Singaroyan Sebastianappan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Salem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMel Kathadikuppam
Ordained BishopInfant Jesus, Cathedral, Salem, Diocese of Salem

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salem.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,854
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast